职业生涯
教练 |
---|
CS Gloria Bistri?a-N?s?ud2022年2月 - 现在 |
Clubul Sportiv Muncitoresc Re?i?a2021年3月 - 2021年6月 |
CS Concordia Chiajna2019年1月 - 2019年6月 |
AFC UTA Arad2017年9月 - 2017年9月 |
CS Concordia Chiajna2015年11月 - 2016年5月 |
ASA Târgu Mure?2014年3月 - 2014年9月 |
FC UTA2014年2月 - 2014年3月 |
FC UTA2012年4月 - 2013年6月 |
ASA Târgu Mure?2010年5月 - 2010年8月 |
CSM Unirea Alba Iulia2009年4月 - 2010年3月 |
- 比赛
- 进球